TN SB1760 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 778
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 778
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates civil immunity for certain members of the national guard who use force against another, including by discharging a personally owned firearm, in certain situations. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, creates civil immunity for certain members of the national guard who use force against another, including by discharging a personally owned firearm, in certain situations. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 778 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2016 | |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0792) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 3/28/2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-03-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0792) |
2016-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0646) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1929 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 778