TN HB1929 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-5)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 778
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-5)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 778
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates civil immunity for certain members of the national guard who use force against another, including by discharging a personally owned firearm, in certain situations. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, creates civil immunity for certain members of the national guard who use force against another, including by discharging a personally owned firearm, in certain situations. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Rep. Eddie Smith [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Marc Gravitt [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] |
Rep. Charles Sargent [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Jeremy Durham [R] |
Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Steve McManus [R] | Rep. Harry Brooks [R] |
Rep. Ron Lollar [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. John Forgety [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] |
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. John Windle [D] |
Rep. Kevin Dunlap [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 778 | |
2016-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1760 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 778
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1929&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1929.pdf |