TN SB1751 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 1023
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 1023
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the select committee on children and youth to study human sex trafficking, the improvements that should be made to existing laws relative to human sex trafficking, and the impact of human sex trafficking on children and youth in this state. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, requires the select committee on children and youth to study human sex trafficking, the improvements that should be made to existing laws relative to human sex trafficking, and the impact of human sex trafficking on children and youth in this state. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Pub. Ch. 1023 | |
2010-06-21 | Effective date(s) 06/09/10 | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-07 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-04 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-04 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-04 | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-04 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1590) | |
2010-06-04 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-05-12 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-05-10 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-05-10 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-10 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1330) | |
2010-05-10 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0985) | |
2010-05-07 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/10/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2009-05-19 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/20/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/19/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1302 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1023