TN SB1750 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Failed in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Failed in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires low speed vehicle to have manufacturer's certificate of origin indicating vehicle's compliance with federal requirements for low speed vehicles submitted with application for initial registration; prevents initial registration of low speed vehicle if certificate of origin not submitted. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As introduced, requires low speed vehicle to have manufacturer's certificate of origin indicating vehicle's compliance with federal requirements for low speed vehicles submitted with application for initial registration; prevents initial registration of low speed vehicle if certificate of origin not submitted. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Failed in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee / no second |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1798 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee