TN SB1728 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes the grading scale that must be used to assign letter grades to students enrolled in grades nine through 12 for purposes of reporting students' grades for postsecondary financial assistance; specifies that the state board or an LEA may develop a grading system for purposes other than reporting students' grades for postsecondary financial assistance. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, establishes the grading scale that must be used to assign letter grades to students enrolled in grades nine through 12 for purposes of reporting students' grades for postsecondary financial assistance; specifies that the state board or an LEA may develop a grading system for purposes other than reporting students' grades for postsecondary financial assistance. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1664 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020