TN SB1725 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds as a ground for termination of parental rights a finding by a court that a parent committed an act of nonconsensual sexual penetration from which act the child was conceived; gives the other parent standing to file a petition for termination of parental rights of the offending parent; includes a finding by a court that a parent committed an act of nonconsensual sexual penetration from which act the child was conceived as a basis for denial of custody, visitation, and inheritance rights. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1 and Title 36, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, adds as a ground for termination of parental rights a finding by a court that a parent committed an act of nonconsensual sexual penetration from which act the child was conceived; gives the other parent standing to file a petition for termination of parental rights of the offending parent; includes a finding by a court that a parent committed an act of nonconsensual sexual penetration from which act the child was conceived as a basis for denial of custody, visitation, and inheritance rights. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1 and Title 36, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2081 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee