TN SB1685 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides for a refund of state sales tax paid on expenditures to rehabilitate historic structures under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 11; Title 13 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, provides for a refund of state sales tax paid on expenditures to rehabilitate historic structures under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 11; Title 13 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation, as amended |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1468 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee