TN SB1678 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds controlling, regulating, monitoring, or depleting the finances, economic resources, credit, or ability to work or pursue education or job training of an adult to the definition of domestic abuse. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6, relative to domestic abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to last calendar |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/8/2022 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1736 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-24 - Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee