TN SB1675 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 690
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 690
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes requirements for inspections of funeral establishments; specifies when records must be made available; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, establishes requirements for inspections of funeral establishments; specifies when records must be made available; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) AMEND# 3 BY Southerland (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) AMEND# 3 BY Southerland (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Pub. Ch. 690 |
2014-04-22 | House | Effective date(s) 04/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-28 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-03-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0 |
2014-03-27 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0916) |
2014-03-27 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0677) |
2014-03-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA0775) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0770) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0646) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/6/2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/6/2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/27/2014 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1380 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 690