TN SB1664 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires nonpartisan elections for chancellors, circuit court judges, criminal court judges, and judges of any other state trial court of record; prohibits a political party from requiring a person to pay a fee in order to run as that political party's candidate for public office. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2 and Title 17, relative to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Comittee to 03/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 1/25/2022 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 1/25/2022 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 1/18/2022 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2064 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee