TN SB1662 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 615
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 615
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain fees payable to the secretary of state by certain charitable organizations; increases from $500,000 to $1,000,000 the amount of gross revenue received during a fiscal year to trigger certain reporting requirements; assesses a late fee per month on certain financial reports that are not timely filed. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5, relative to charitable organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 615 | |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1708 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024, 07/01/2024