TN SB1662 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, recognizes the legal authority to use blockchain technology and smart contracts in conducting electronic transactions; protects ownership rights of certain information secured by blockchain technology. - Amends TCA Title 12; Title 47; Title 48; Title 61 and Title 66.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, recognizes the legal authority to use blockchain technology and smart contracts in conducting electronic transactions; protects ownership rights of certain information secured by blockchain technology. - Amends TCA Title 12; Title 47; Title 48; Title 61 and Title 66.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2018
2018-02-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 2/20/2018
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/13/2018
2018-01-24SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-18SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1507 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-20 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback