TN HB1507 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 591
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, recognizes the legal authority to use distributed ledger technology and smart contracts in conducting electronic transactions; protects ownership rights of certain information secured by distributed ledger technology. - Amends TCA Title 12; Title 47; Title 48; Title 61 and Title 66.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, recognizes the legal authority to use distributed ledger technology and smart contracts in conducting electronic transactions; protects ownership rights of certain information secured by distributed ledger technology. - Amends TCA Title 12; Title 47; Title 48; Title 61 and Title 66.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 591
2018-03-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-08HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-03-01HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2018
2018-02-28HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018
2018-02-27HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-02-21HousePlaced on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/27/2018
2018-02-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
2018-02-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-15HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
2018-02-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 2/21/2018
2018-02-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2018-01-17HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
2018-01-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-10HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1662 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 591

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback