TN SB1650 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Pub. Ch. 487
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Pub. Ch. 487
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the select committee on children and youth to study the effectiveness of the child protective services system in Tennessee and develop recommendations for its improvement.
Title
As enacted, requires the select committee on children and youth to study the effectiveness of the child protective services system in Tennessee and develop recommendations for its improvement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Pub. Ch. 487 | |
2009-07-01 | Effective date(s) 06/23/09 | |
2009-06-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-12 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-06-08 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-04 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-03 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-06-01 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-01 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0549) | |
2009-06-01 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-05-20 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-05-18 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-05-18 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2009-05-18 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0537) | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/18/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1383 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 487