TN HB1383 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 487
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 487
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the select committee on children and youth to study the effectiveness of the child protective services system in Tennessee and develop recommendations for its improvement.
Title
As enacted, requires the select committee on children and youth to study the effectiveness of the child protective services system in Tennessee and develop recommendations for its improvement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 487 | |
2009-06-01 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-05-28 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/09 | |
2009-05-28 | Reset on regular cal. for 6/1/09 | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/28/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-05-13 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in Children and Family Affairs Committee to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in Children and Family Affairs Committee to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1650 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-01 - Pub. Ch. 487
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1383&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1383.pdf |