TN SB1639 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, places the Tennessee monuments and memorials commission in the sunset law with a scheduled termination date of June 30, 2025. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 4 and Title 4, Chapter 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 4 and Title 4, Chapter 29, relative to the Tennessee monuments and memorials commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Effective date(s) 03/27/2024 | |
2024-04-03 | Pub. Ch. 599 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 2, PNV 2 |
2024-03-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-02-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 4, PNV 2 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/15/2024 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/7/2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1782 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 599