TN SB1635 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 854
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 854
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes, instead of requires, approval by the comptroller and attorney general for compromises of state tax liabilities; allows taxpayers to request informal conferences disputing proposed notices of assessments; requires any suit challenging an assessment to be filed within 90 days from the date of final assessment; revises other provisions regarding issuing and disputing assessments. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, authorizes, instead of requires, approval by the comptroller and attorney general for compromises of state tax liabilities; allows taxpayers to request informal conferences disputing proposed notices of assessments; requires any suit challenging an assessment to be filed within 90 days from the date of final assessment; revises other provisions regarding issuing and disputing assessments. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 854 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1122) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/8/14 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/recommend, as amended |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/4/2014 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1431 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 854