TN SB1634 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 718
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 718
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases from “eight months to a year” to “32 to 36 months” the time within which the treasurer must sell a security after receiving it; extends from “eight months” to “32 months” the minimum time period during which the treasurer is required to hold a security prior to selling it and paying the sale proceeds to the owner, upon the owner's request. - Amends TCA Section 66-29-142 and Section 66-29-154.
Title
As enacted, increases from “eight months to a year” to “32 to 36 months” the time within which the treasurer must sell a security after receiving it; extends from “eight months” to “32 months” the minimum time period during which the treasurer is required to hold a security prior to selling it and paying the sale proceeds to the owner, upon the owner's request. - Amends TCA Section 66-29-142 and Section 66-29-154.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 718 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/13/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/11/2020 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1851 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 718