TN HB1851 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 718
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 718
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases from “eight months to a year” to “32 to 36 months” the time within which the treasurer must sell a security after receiving it; extends from “eight months” to “32 months” the minimum time period during which the treasurer is required to hold a security prior to selling it and paying the sale proceeds to the owner, upon the owner's request. - Amends TCA Section 66-29-142 and Section 66-29-154.
Title
As enacted, increases from “eight months to a year” to “32 to 36 months” the time within which the treasurer must sell a security after receiving it; extends from “eight months” to “32 months” the minimum time period during which the treasurer is required to hold a security prior to selling it and paying the sale proceeds to the owner, upon the owner's request. - Amends TCA Section 66-29-142 and Section 66-29-154.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 718 | |
2020-06-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-15 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on State Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1634 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 718