TN SB1630 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 697
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 697
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a county mayor to appoint a committee to approve amendments to the budget after the budget has been adopted under the Local Option Budgeting Law of 1993. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 12, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a county mayor to appoint a committee to approve amendments to the budget after the budget has been adopted under the Local Option Budgeting Law of 1993. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 12, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 697 | |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 6/4/2020 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1571 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 697