TN SB1618 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 725
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 725
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes from education laws obsolete pilot projects and reporting and similar requirements; revises and deletes certain other education-related provisions and reporting requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, removes from education laws obsolete pilot projects and reporting and similar requirements; revises and deletes certain other education-related provisions and reporting requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 725 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 04/18/2018 | |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 79, Nays 7, PNV 2 |
2018-04-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-02 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 23, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0878) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1968 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 725