TN SB1618 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a court presiding over a legal proceeding to authorize a witness to utilize the assistance of a courthouse facility dog during testimony. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 1; Title 24, Chapter 1 and Title 40, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a court presiding over a legal proceeding to authorize a witness to utilize the assistance of a courthouse facility dog during testimony. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 1; Title 24, Chapter 1 and Title 40, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/16/2016 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/2/2016 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1987 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-02 - Referred to A.O.C. for review
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1618&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1618.pdf |