TN SB1616 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 717
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 717
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the period of time after a local board of education or director of schools makes an initial offer of employment to a person for a teaching position that the person has to accept or reject the offer of employment, if the offer is made between June 1 and April 1. - Amends TCA Section 49-5-406.
Title
As enacted, revises the period of time after a local board of education or director of schools makes an initial offer of employment to a person for a teaching position that the person has to accept or reject the offer of employment, if the offer is made between June 1 and April 1. - Amends TCA Section 49-5-406.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 3 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY CURCIO PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 24 N: 59 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY CURCIO PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 24 N: 59 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 717 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 08/01/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 3 - HA0828) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0770) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 83, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2020-06-10 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0853) |
2020-06-10 | House | Am. reconsidered. (Amendment 4 - HA0853) |
2020-06-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA0853) |
2020-06-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0828) |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-02 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Re-ref. Education |
2020-06-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/3/20 |
2020-06-01 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2020-06-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0770) |
2020-06-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0572) |
2020-06-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0502) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/27/2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/27/2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/19/2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1617 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 717