TN SB1613 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits the use of certain defenses to unlawful possession or carrying of a weapon by a person with a prior conviction for a felony involving the use of force, violence, deadly weapon, or drugs and whose rights of citizenship have been restored. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1308.
Title
As introduced, permits the use of certain defenses to unlawful possession or carrying of a weapon by a person with a prior conviction for a felony involving the use of force, violence, deadly weapon, or drugs and whose rights of citizenship have been restored. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1308.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2016 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1565 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-02 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration