TN SB1612 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the department of labor and workforce development to June 30, 2026. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3, relative to the department of labor and workforce development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Effective date(s) 03/27/2024 | |
2024-04-03 | Pub. Ch. 595 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-07 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0596) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/28/2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1755 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 595