TN SB1610 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends from June 30, 2018, to June 30, 2019, the repeal date for the provision allowing the commissioner of correction to extend the limitation period for claims against the state for the payment of costs and fees by an additional six months. - Amends Chapter 85 of the Public Acts of 2017.
Title
As enacted, extends from June 30, 2018, to June 30, 2019, the repeal date for the provision allowing the commissioner of correction to extend the limitation period for claims against the state for the payment of costs and fees by an additional six months. - Amends Chapter 85 of the Public Acts of 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 561 | |
2018-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/14/2018 | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-02-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/1/2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 1/30/2018 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1725 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 561