TN SB1597 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Tennessee Come Back for Your Future scholarship program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Title
As introduced, creates the Tennessee Come Back for Your Future scholarship program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Action Def. in S .F,W,&M Comm. to 4/16/14 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 2/19/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 2/5/2014 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1457 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-09 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2014