TN SB1596 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 904
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 904
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates separate offenses for the manufacture, delivery, sale, or possession with intent to manufacture, deliver or sell methamphetamine and for possession or causal exchange of methamphetamine. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, creates separate offenses for the manufacture, delivery, sale, or possession with intent to manufacture, deliver or sell methamphetamine and for possession or causal exchange of methamphetamine. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-28 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 904 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 1/28/2014 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1456 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 904