TN SB1595 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 03/15/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 03/15/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits emotional support animals that are not trained, or being trained, to perform tasks or work for a person with a disability from indoor areas of food service establishments. - Amends TCA Section 6-54-135; Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 2; Title 44 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 6-54-135; Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 2; Title 44 and Title 68, relative to animals in food service establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/15/2024 | |
2024-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 566 | |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 4, PNV 2 |
2024-03-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-02-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 1/23/2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1635 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 566