TN SB1594 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a court of competent jurisdiction, upon granting visitation rights to the grandparents of a child who is removed from the custody of the child's parents, guardians, or legal custodian, to reduce to writing the factors that went into making the determination to grant grandparent visitation rights and include the writing in the case file. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, relative to grandparents' rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1422 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-01 - Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee