TN SB1593 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prescribes a process by which the joint government operations committee of the general assembly may review an executive order of the President of the United States for its constitutionality under federal law and submits its findings and recommendations to the attorney general and reporter and the governor. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3, Chapter 4, relative to executive orders issued by the President of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1120 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-07 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration