TN SB1592 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decreases from 90 to 80 percent the amount of revenue an art gallery must receive from the sale of artwork in order to serve wine to patrons without charge and without paying a fee. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As introduced, decreases from 90 to 80 percent the amount of revenue an art gallery must receive from the sale of artwork in order to serve wine to patrons without charge and without paying a fee. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1567 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-19 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee