TN SB1556 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 926
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, declares that no person providing counseling or therapy services will be required to counsel or serve a client as to goals, outcomes, or behaviors that conflict with the sincerely held principles of the counselor or therapist; requires such counselor or therapist to refer the client to another counselor or therapist; creates immunity for such action; maintains liability for counselors who will not counsel a client based on the counselor's religious beliefs when the individual seeking or undergoing the counseling is in imminent danger of harming themselves or others. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, declares that no person providing counseling or therapy services will be required to counsel or serve a client as to goals, outcomes, or behaviors that conflict with the sincerely held principles of the counselor or therapist; requires such counselor or therapist to refer the client to another counselor or therapist; creates immunity for such action; maintains liability for counselors who will not counsel a client based on the counselor's religious beliefs when the individual seeking or undergoing the counseling is in imminent danger of harming themselves or others. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49 and Title 63.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 43 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: motion to yield AMENDMENT # 3 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 27 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 22 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: motion to yield AMENDMENT # 4 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 23 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: limit debate MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 62 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Yarbro (Y: 5 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 3 BY Yarbro (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-02 Pub. Ch. 926
2016-05-02 Effective date(s) 04/27/2016
2016-04-27SenateSigned by Governor.
2016-04-15SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2016-04-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-04-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2016-04-11SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-04-11SenateConcurred, Ayes 25, Nays 6 (Amendment 1 - HA1006)
2016-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/11/2016
2016-04-06HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 68, Nays 22, PNV 0
2016-04-06HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 6 - HA1136)
2016-04-06HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 5 - HA1135)
2016-04-06HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 4 - HA1134)
2016-04-06HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 3 - HA1133)
2016-04-06HouseFailed to adopt, Ayes 22, Nays 73, PNV 0
2016-04-06HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1006)
2016-04-06HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2016-02-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2016-02-18SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-17SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2016-02-17SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 5
2016-02-17SenateFailed to adopt, Ayes 5, Nays 24 (Amendment 2 - SA0538)
2016-02-17SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0539)
2016-02-17SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0526)
2016-02-11SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/17/2016
2016-02-10SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
2016-02-10SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
2016-02-03SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/10/2016
2016-01-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/10/2016
2016-01-20SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 1/27/2016
2016-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1840 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 926

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback