TN HB1840 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 926
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, declares that no person providing counseling or therapy services will be required to counsel or serve a client as to goals, outcomes, or behaviors that conflict with the sincerely held principles of the counselor or therapist; requires such counselor or therapist to refer the client to another counselor or therapist; creates immunity for such action; maintains liability for counselors who will not counsel a client based on the counselor's religious beliefs when the individual seeking or undergoing the counseling is in imminent danger of harming themselves or others. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, declares that no person providing counseling or therapy services will be required to counsel or serve a client as to goals, outcomes, or behaviors that conflict with the sincerely held principles of the counselor or therapist; requires such counselor or therapist to refer the client to another counselor or therapist; creates immunity for such action; maintains liability for counselors who will not counsel a client based on the counselor's religious beliefs when the individual seeking or undergoing the counseling is in imminent danger of harming themselves or others. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49 and Title 63.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-23 - House - HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-02 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 926
2016-04-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-04-06HouseComp. SB subst.
2016-04-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-31HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-31HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2016
2016-03-30HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016
2016-03-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-23HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2016-03-16HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2016
2016-03-16HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/23/2016
2016-03-10HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-09HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/16/2016
2016-03-09HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/16/2016
2016-03-02HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/9/2016
2016-03-01HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2016-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2016
2016-02-23HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
2016-02-18HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/23/2016
2016-02-17HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-16HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/23/2016
2016-02-16HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/16/2016
2016-02-09HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/16/2016
2016-02-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/9/2016
2016-01-26HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2016-01-21HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2016-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2016-01-19HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1556 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 926

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback