TN SB1556 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-09 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-09 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes issuance of I RECYCLE new specialty earmarked license plates; earmarks proceeds from such plates for certain recycling efforts. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, authorizes issuance of I RECYCLE new specialty earmarked license plates; earmarks proceeds from such plates for certain recycling efforts. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Senate - S. TRANS CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Senate - S. TRANS CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-04-06 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-04-06 | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 04/06/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on S. Trans Consent cal. for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1660 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-24 - Action Def. in Transportation Committee to Omnibus Special License Plate Bill