TN SB1555 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits local governments from requiring a company bidding on a local construction project to employ individuals that reside within the jurisdiction of the local government. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 62.
Title
As introduced, prohibits local governments from requiring a company bidding on a local construction project to employ individuals that reside within the jurisdiction of the local government. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 62.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1555&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1555.pdf |