TN SB1541 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, eliminates the tax assessor's duty of collecting a fee for services in placing a stamp on a deed. - Amends Chapter 896 of the Private Acts of 1949.
Title
Subject to local approval, eliminates the tax assessor's duty of collecting a fee for services in placing a stamp on a deed. - Amends Chapter 896 of the Private Acts of 1949.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 33 | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1533 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 33