TN SB1521 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, moves date of election for mayor and aldermen of the City of Ripley from April to the first Thursday in August at the regular general election; makes various other changes to the charter for the City of Ripley. - Amends Chapter 128 of the Private Acts of 2006.
Title
Subject to local approval, moves date of election for mayor and aldermen of the City of Ripley from April to the first Thursday in August at the regular general election; makes various other changes to the charter for the City of Ripley. - Amends Chapter 128 of the Private Acts of 2006.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 23 | |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1514 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 23