TN HB1514 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, moves date of election for mayor and aldermen of the City of Ripley from April to the first Thursday in August at the regular general election; makes various other changes to the charter for the City of Ripley. - Amends Chapter 128 of the Private Acts of 2006.
Title
Subject to local approval, moves date of election for mayor and aldermen of the City of Ripley from April to the first Thursday in August at the regular general election; makes various other changes to the charter for the City of Ripley. - Amends Chapter 128 of the Private Acts of 2006.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pr. Ch. 23 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0250) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0291) |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Action def. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1521 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 23