TN SB1520 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, changes the maximum amount of expenditures to the state-adopted maximum that the city, board of education, and public work or improvement may spend on a purchase unless bids are requested through advertisement; reduces the term length from two years to one year for the chairperson, vice-chairperson, secretary, and treasurer of the board of education. - Amends Chapter 455 of the Private Acts of 1953; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, changes the maximum amount of expenditures to the state-adopted maximum that the city, board of education, and public work or improvement may spend on a purchase unless bids are requested through advertisement; reduces the term length from two years to one year for the chairperson, vice-chairperson, secretary, and treasurer of the board of education. - Amends Chapter 455 of the Private Acts of 1953; as amended.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 7 | |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1513 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pr. Ch. 7