TN SB1505 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 899
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 899
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises laws relating to non-profit corporations. - Amends TCA Title 48.
Title
As enacted, revises laws relating to non-profit corporations. - Amends TCA Title 48.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Pub. Ch. 899 |
2014-05-16 | House | Effective date(s) 05/09/2014; 01/01/2015 |
2014-05-09 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-17 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-16 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 99, Nays 0 |
2014-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0687) |
2014-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0562) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0642) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/24/2014 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 1/21/2014 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1442 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 899