TN SB1477 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 875
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 875
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, reduces the fee for lifetime handgun carry permit, effective January 1, 2017, from $500 to be an amount equal to the regular carry permit fee plus $200, which under present law will equal $300 for the lifetime permit. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Title
As enacted, reduces the fee for lifetime handgun carry permit, effective January 1, 2017, from $500 to be an amount equal to the regular carry permit fee plus $200, which under present law will equal $300 for the lifetime permit. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 875 | |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2016 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1424 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 875