TN SB1471 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 797
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 797
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions governing reporting functions of public entities and officials. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 17; Title 23; Title 29; Title 33; Title 37; Title 49; Title 50; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 64; Title 65; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions governing reporting functions of public entities and officials. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 17; Title 23; Title 29; Title 33; Title 37; Title 49; Title 50; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 64; Title 65; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 797 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/14/2016 | |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-03-31 | House | Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 15, PNV 7 |
2016-03-31 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0941) |
2016-03-31 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0758) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/15/2016 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1702 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 797