TN SB1471 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Conf. comm. appointed. (J. DeBerry, Hensley, C. Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Conf. comm. appointed. (J. DeBerry, Hensley, C. Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires school year to begin no earlier than fourth Monday in August unless the department of education grants a waiver; requires department to create a timeline detailing how state will meet federal school choice notification requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires school year to begin no earlier than fourth Monday in August unless the department of education grants a waiver; requires department to create a timeline detailing how state will meet federal school choice notification requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 21 BY Gilmore PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Casada PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Casada PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED AMEND# 4 BY Barnes (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 TO AMEND# 4 AMEND# 4 BY Barnes (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 21 BY Gilmore PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Casada PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Casada PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED AMEND# 4 BY Barnes (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 TO AMEND# 4 AMEND# 4 BY Barnes (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Conf. comm. appointed. (J. DeBerry, Hensley, C. Johnson) | |
2012-05-01 | Conf. comm. appointed. (Barnes, Gresham, Tracy) | |
2012-05-01 | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence | |
2012-05-01 | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence | |
2012-05-01 | S. refused to concur in ams. 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 4, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 22 | |
2012-05-01 | S. concurred in H. am. 2 | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 5/1/2012 | |
2011-05-19 | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 23 | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 22 of 0 - HA0490) | |
2011-05-16 | Am. 21 tabled Ayes 60, Nays 31, PNV 1 | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 20 of 0 - HA0488) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 19 of 0 - HA0487) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 18 of 0 - HA0486) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 17 of 0 - HA0485) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 16 of 0 - HA0484) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 15 of 0 - HA0483) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 14 of 0 - HA0482) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 13 of 0 - HA0481) | |
2011-05-16 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 12 - HA0480) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 4 of 0 - HA0454) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 11 of 0 - HA0479) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 10 of 0 - HA0478) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 9 of 0 - HA0477) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 8 of 0 - HA0476) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 7 of 0 - HA0475) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 6 of 0 - HA0474) | |
2011-05-16 | Reconsidered, H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0362) | |
2011-05-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 5 of 0 - HA0460) | |
2011-05-16 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA0443) | |
2011-05-16 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0362) | |
2011-05-16 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0316) | |
2011-05-16 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-05-16 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-05-12 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-05-12 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 24, Nays 5 | |
2011-05-12 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0314) | |
2011-05-12 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA0373) | |
2011-05-12 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 4 of 1 - SA0524) | |
2011-05-12 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 4 of 0 - SA0437) | |
2011-05-12 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0372) | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-09 | S. Reset on Cal. for 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/9/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | S. Reset on cal. for 5/9/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/5/2011 | |
2011-04-28 | S. Reset on Cal. for 5/5/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1805 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-16 - Comp. SB subst.