TN SB1464 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the University of Memphis to evaluate the university's educational programs to determine if changes are needed in any of the educational programs and to make the needed changes. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 11; Title 12; Title 49; Title 58; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 11; Title 12; Title 49; Title 58; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to the University of Memphis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0823 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee