TN SB1438 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the TCRS to divest direct holdings in companies that have substantial current operations in Iran, as determined by the list of companies identified in quarterly reports submitted to the council on pensions and insurance under present law. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 24; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36; Title 8, Chapter 37; Title 8, Chapter 5 and Title 9.
Title
As introduced, requires the TCRS to divest direct holdings in companies that have substantial current operations in Iran, as determined by the list of companies identified in quarterly reports submitted to the council on pensions and insurance under present law. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 24; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36; Title 8, Chapter 37; Title 8, Chapter 5 and Title 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2191 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1438&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1438.pdf |