TN SB1427 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, creates term limits for the board of mayor and alderman; makes certain changes to the qualifications for the mayor and aldermen. - Amends Chapter 43 of the Private Acts of 2001.
Title
Subject to local approval, creates term limits for the board of mayor and alderman; makes certain changes to the qualifications for the mayor and aldermen. - Amends Chapter 43 of the Private Acts of 2001.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 2 | |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 3/30/2017 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1414 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-21 - Pr. Ch. 2