TN SB1417 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from $1,000 to $1,500 the maximum amount that can be assessed as a civil penalty per violation by an entity advertising or representing any loan, refinance, insurance, or any other product or service that is untrue, deceptive, misleading, or that uses the name or logo of any other lender without the express written consent of the lender whose name is used. - Amends TCA Title 45 and Title 47.
Title
As introduced, increases from $1,000 to $1,500 the maximum amount that can be assessed as a civil penalty per violation by an entity advertising or representing any loan, refinance, insurance, or any other product or service that is untrue, deceptive, misleading, or that uses the name or logo of any other lender without the express written consent of the lender whose name is used. - Amends TCA Title 45 and Title 47.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1073 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee