TN SB1410 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, states that the court in a criminal proceeding or juvenile delinquency proceeding may request the person claiming to be indigent provide relevant documents to assist the court in making a determination of indigence. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 21; Title 16; Title 20, Chapter 12; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, states that the court in a criminal proceeding or juvenile delinquency proceeding may request the person claiming to be indigent provide relevant documents to assist the court in making a determination of indigence. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 21; Title 16; Title 20, Chapter 12; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1453 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.