TN HB1453 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, states that the court in a criminal proceeding or juvenile delinquency proceeding may request the person claiming to be indigent provide relevant documents to assist the court in making a determination of indigence. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 21; Title 16; Title 20, Chapter 12; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, states that the court in a criminal proceeding or juvenile delinquency proceeding may request the person claiming to be indigent provide relevant documents to assist the court in making a determination of indigence. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 21; Title 16; Title 20, Chapter 12; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-01-22 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 1/29/2020 |
2019-04-10 | House | Action def. in Judiciary to First Calendar of 2020 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1410 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee